MD SB677 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changing to 8 a.m. the beginning hour of sale for specified alcoholic beverages licenses issued in Carroll County.
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253495/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Time