MD SB677 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to post on its website a report that includes certain ownership, utilization, and financial data regarding licensed nursing homes in the State by January 31 each year; and requiring the Commission to publish on its website searchable information on certain licensed nursing homes, including information from and links to cost reports filed with the Commission by nursing homes.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823220/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
internet
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
internet
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |