MD SB689 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending a specified tax rate reduction under the Prince George's County transfer tax to the sale of specified property to a Prince George's County deputy sheriff under specified circumstances.
Title
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |