MD SB694 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to participate in a specified database; altering the authority of the Commissioner to allow a commercial insured to waive specified search requirements for surplus lines coverage for specified purposes; authorizing a surplus lines broker not to perform a diligent search when placing specified coverage with an exempt commercial purchaser under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Budgets
Campaign Financing
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Fees
Gifts
Governor
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Judicial Review
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Lobbying
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Budgets
Campaign Financing
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Fees
Gifts
Governor
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Judicial Review
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Lobbying
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Work, Labor and Employment