MD SB695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the construction of new multifamily residential buildings with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each residential unit to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle charging; requiring certain significant renovations of housing units with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each residential unit to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle recharging; etc.
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB889 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Apartments
Building Codes
Condominiums
Construction
Electric Motor Vehicles
Fines
Home Improvement
Parking
Public Safety
Residential Property
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Building Codes
Condominiums
Construction
Electric Motor Vehicles
Fines
Home Improvement
Parking
Public Safety
Residential Property
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0695?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0695f.pdf |