MD SB699 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Equitech Growth Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to support the economic competitiveness and inclusive growth of emerging and advanced industries in the State through the creation of supporting infrastructure assets, resources, and a diverse workforce that builds the strengths of the State's economy; establishing the Equitech Growth Commission; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2025 through 2033 to include $5,000,000 in the annual budget bill for awards from the Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Equitech Growth Fund and Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Melony Griffith [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-16) |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Ways and Means Appropriations |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-7) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {553926/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB781 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Investments
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Investments
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 488 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |