MD SB7 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the prohibition against selling, distributing, or offering for sale an electronic device to a minor that can be used to deliver nicotine includes any component for the device or product used to refill or resupply the device; clarifying that the exception to the prohibition for devices approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration applies only to devices for sale as a tobacco cessation product; changing a violation of the prohibition from a misdemeanor to a civil infraction; etc.
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-44) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273499/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707972/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Cigarettes
Citations
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Health
Smoking
Trials
Citations
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Health
Smoking
Trials