MD SB71 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date for the Small Business Reserve Program to September 30, 2016.
Title
Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-01-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-01-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |