MD SB71 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Commission on Surrogate Parenting; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; providing that a member of the Commission may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study specified issues related to surrogate parenting; requiring the Commission to make specified recommendations, if possible; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Commission on Surrogate Parenting
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/3 at 2:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2011-01-19 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings & Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0071.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0071f.pdf |