MD SB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using sperm or eggs from a known donor after the donor's death for the purpose of assisted reproduction without the prior consent of the donor; establishing requirements for a valid consent; and establishing penalties for a specified violation of provisions of the Act; altering the definition of the word "child" for purposes of provisions of law regarding inheritance; etc.
Title
Health - General - Posthumous Use of Donor Sperm and Eggs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2012-03-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-01 | Floor Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) 748976/1 Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Getty) Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Getty) Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Reilly) Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 837672/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-20 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Finance |