MD SB71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, notwithstanding specified provisions of law, and with a specified exception, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation from purchasing an agricultural land preservation easement for more than 75% or less than 25% of the fair market value of the land; and authorizing the Foundation to purchase an easement for less than 25% of the fair market value of the land if the asking price is less than 25% of the fair market value of the land.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-09-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |