MD SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting an erroneous reference in a certain provision of law authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to suspend or revoke the certificate of qualification of a surplus lines broker under certain circumstances.
Title
Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Licenses
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Licenses