MD SB711 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health occupations board to send by first-class mail a renewal application at the request of a licensee, permit holder, certificate holder, or registrant if the health occupations board chooses to send renewal notices or renewed licenses, permits, certifications, or registrations exclusively by e-mail under certain provisions of law.
Title
Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |