MD SB725 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a residential lease to include a requirement that a tenant hold a renter's insurance policy; prohibiting a lease from containing certain requirements regarding a renter's insurance policy; and requiring a landlord to acquire a renter's insurance policy on behalf of a tenant if the tenant does not have a policy.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Renter's Insurance Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB564 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |