MD SB733 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to establish, by December 31, 2021, a training program and a skills review for nurses who care for medically fragile individuals in the individuals' homes; defining "medically fragile individual" as a person under 21 who has a complex medical condition requiring professional or parental supervision on a 24-hour basis; requiring, beginning January 1, 2022, a nurse who provides care to a medically fragile individual to complete a certain training program before beginning to provide care; etc.
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Disabilities
Diseases
Education
Equipment
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Hospitals
Inspections
Job Training
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Disabilities
Diseases
Education
Equipment
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Hospitals
Inspections
Job Training
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 4A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0733?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0733f.pdf |