MD SB735 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of both the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a royalty; requiring the Governor to make a specified appropriation beginning in fiscal year 2016; etc.
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appropriations
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Cigarettes
Diseases
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Medical Research
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking
Sunset
Tobacco
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Cigarettes
Diseases
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Medical Research
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking
Sunset
Tobacco