MD SB737 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified limits on debt in St. Mary's County; subjecting specified bonds and other evidences of indebtedness issued under the authority of the St. Mary's County Sanitary Commission Act to a specified limitation; and requiring the responsibility for repayment to remain with the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission.
Title
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {813225/1 (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {219231/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |