MD SB744 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child of a certain age alleged to have committed a certain offense; altering certain procedures relating to juvenile intake, detention, and probation; requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to include certain programs in a certain plan; requiring the State Board of Victim Services to include certain information about filing a certain complaint in a certain pamphlet; repealing certain provisions relating to the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 633827/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 633827/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {633827/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-29) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {503627/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {313024/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {973922/1 (Senator Charles) Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {993224/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {203524/1 Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB814 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Age
Animals
Arrests
Attorneys
Awareness and Outreach
Citations
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Courts
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Education
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Guns
Health, Department of
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pretrial Detention or Release
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sheriffs
Social Services
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
State's Attorneys
Theft
Time
Transfer of Goods
Trials
Victims
Violence
Weapons
Age
Animals
Arrests
Attorneys
Awareness and Outreach
Citations
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Courts
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Education
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Guns
Health, Department of
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pretrial Detention or Release
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sheriffs
Social Services
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
State's Attorneys
Theft
Time
Transfer of Goods
Trials
Victims
Violence
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |