MD SB75 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education, instead of the State Department of Education, to revoke the certificate of approval or letter of tentative approval of a nonpublic school that is in violation of specified provisions of law prohibiting the employment of specified employees who have been convicted of specified crimes.
Title
Education - Nonpublic School Employees - Criminal Convictions
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-01-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-01-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing 1/21 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/21 at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-10-15 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Education, State Board of
Private Schools
Sexual Offenses
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Education, State Board of
Private Schools
Sexual Offenses
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment