MD SB75 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an employee of the Investigative Division of the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue citations to the same extent as a police officer under specified circumstances; and altering the violations for which an employee of the Investigative Division may issue a citation under specified circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Citations
Drivers' Licenses
Forgery
Fraud
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Drivers' Licenses
Forgery
Fraud
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous