MD SB75 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling at retail an alcoholic beverage with an alcohol content of 95% (190 proof) or more; and stating that a person who violates the provision is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a fine not exceeding $1,000.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-43) (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-35) (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-35) (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-43) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-35) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513293/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {834634/1 Report Adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Penalties and Sentences
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Penalties and Sentences