MD SB75 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person that constructs new homes for sale to the public to purchase a performance bond for the construction of each new home; requiring the liability under a performance bond to be for a period of 5 years after completion; prohibiting a home builder from beginning construction of a new home under certain circumstances; and altering the circumstances under which a building and permits department of a county may not issue a certain permit to include failure to purchase a performance bond.
Title
Business Regulation - Home Builders - Performance Bond Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |