MD SB755 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain lending institution that makes a certain loan secured by a certain first mortgage or first deed of trust to create a certain escrow account solely for the payment of water and sewer facilities assessments on a certain request; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to the payment of water and sewer facilities assessments under a certain direct reduction method; providing that funds in a certain escrow account for use for certain purposes may not be used in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837479/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Assessments
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Deeds
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Mortgages
Prices
Real Property
Records
Sewage
Water
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Deeds
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Mortgages
Prices
Real Property
Records
Sewage
Water