MD SB766 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from operating as an oil or gas land professional in the State unless the person registers with and obtains a registration certificate from the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; requiring a person to register as a land professional in a specified manner; requiring the Department to assign a registration number and issue a registration certificate to a specified person; requiring a land professional to provide specified proof to a property owner before obtaining specified mineral rights; etc.
Title
Business Occupations - Oil and Gas Land Professionals - Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Crimes and Punishments
Environment
Fees
Fines
Forms
Fuel
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Mining
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Real Property
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Crimes and Punishments
Environment
Fees
Fines
Forms
Fuel
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Mining
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Real Property
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations