MD SB771 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain hours of sale, certain square footage requirements, and a certain license fee for the holder of a public market license in the 46th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to waive certain distance restrictions for an application for the transfer of a license into a certain area; repealing a provision of law authorizing the Board to issue not more than two Class B licenses in a certain area in the 46th alcoholic beverages district; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Floor Amendment {643327/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463229/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {473622/1 Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1115 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
Fees
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
News Media
Notices
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
Fees
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
News Media
Notices
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1002.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |