MD SB775 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified buyers and beneficiaries of pre-need contracts to request that the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors conduct specified audits; requiring the Board to require specified funeral establishments or holders of permits for the business of operating a crematory to submit specified reports; requiring specified holders of permits to engage in the operation of a crematory to submit specified reports on unclaimed cremains to the Office of Cemetery Oversight on or after a specified date; etc.
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] |
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Cremation
Death
Disclosure
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Auditors and Audits
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Cremation
Death
Disclosure
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology