MD SB777 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a domestic ceding insurer be allowed credit for reinsurance in specified manners under specified circumstances; providing for specified credit to be allowed under specified circumstances depending on the licensure or authorization status and accreditation status of the assuming insurer; establishing requirements and procedures for an assuming reinsurer to be accredited by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; etc.
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {477976/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Associations
Business Trusts
Credit
Hearings
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Securities
Business Trusts
Credit
Hearings
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Securities