MD SB790 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the policy of specified provisions of law relating to limited liability companies; providing that a specified provision of law that may be changed by an operating agreement also may be changed by the terms of articles of organization; establishing that specified rights and conditions with regard to a limited liability company will be enforceable to the extent provided for in the operating agreement; authorizing an operating agreement to alter specified duties and liabilities; etc.
Title
Limited Liability Company Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |