MD SB791 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, on the recommendation of the Secretary of General Services, the Board of Public Works to waive a requirement to include an automatic termination clause in specified multi-year contracts for the procurement of energy generated from specified renewable sources; and requiring the Board to consider a specified factor in determining whether to grant a specified waiver.
Title
Procurement - Multi-Year Contracts for Renewable Energy - Termination Clauses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (126-12) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Contracts
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Contracts
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Procurement
Public Works, Board of