MD SB791 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the juvenile court, except under specified circumstances, from committing a child who has committed a specified offense to the Department of Juvenile Services for out-of-home placement; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {718574/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Foster Care
Group Homes
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Nuisances
Prostitution
Theft
Trespass
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Foster Care
Group Homes
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Nuisances
Prostitution
Theft
Trespass