MD SB793 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a beer and wine consumption permit and a beer, wine, and liquor consumption permit in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue the permits to holders of Class A alcoholic beverages licenses to allow for on-premises consumption of beer and wine; requiring an applicant for a permit to submit an application to the Board; authorizing the Board to issue a permit under certain circumstances; providing for the renewal of a permit; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623194/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1242 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Appeals
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Fees
Forms
Frederick County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Appeals
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Fees
Forms
Frederick County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1102.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |