MD SB795 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the determination of the Maryland estate tax to exclude up to $3,000,000 from the value of the gross estate the value of specified agricultural property and the value of a specified interest in a small business; providing for the recapture of specified Maryland estate tax if specified agricultural property is sold under specified circumstances; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; defining specified terms; and applying the Act to decedents dying after December 31, 2011.
Title
Estate Tax - Exemption for Family Farm or Small Business
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Comptroller
Equipment
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Farmland
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Comptroller
Equipment
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Farmland
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0795.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0795f.pdf |