MD SB795 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting private career schools, for-profit institutions of higher education, and certain institutions of higher education required to register with the Maryland Higher Education Commission under certain circumstances from enrolling certain students in certain programs under certain circumstances; requiring certain schools or institutions to provide to prospective students certain information before the student signs an enrollment agreement, completes registration, or makes a financial commitment to the school or institution; etc.
Title
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-14) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {334564/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424530/1 Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424530/1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Bonds
Communications
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Loans
Notices
Private Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tuition
Communications
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Loans
Notices
Private Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tuition