MD SB802 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a continuing care retirement community license in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license for use by a continuing care retirement community that is located in the 41st alcoholic beverages district of the City and that has obtained a certain certificate of registration; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor to a community resident or the guest of a resident for on-premises consumption; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Continuing Care
Registration
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Continuing Care
Registration
Retail Sales