MD SB810 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for up to $240 a month of commuter expenses of an individual; reducing the amount allowed as a subtraction by the amount excluded for the same purposes from federal gross income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2011; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commuter Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | Re-assigned Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0810.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0810f.pdf |