MD SB810 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain small business entities located in an enterprise zone or a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone; allowing a small business to qualify for the credit if the business hired and retained at least one new employee for at least 6 months; allowing a small business to apply the credit for each employee who is hired that results in a net increase in the number of employees hired and retained by the business; etc.
Title
Job Reinvestment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Income Tax
Property Tax
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Enterprise Zones
Income Tax
Property Tax
Small Business
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment