MD SB810 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence to provide certain grants to counties for use to house homeless veterans and survivors of domestic violence; authorizing the Governor to include funding in the budget for FY 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter for the Program; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to distribute grants to counties and to establish grant application procedures; authorizing the Department to establish preferences for certain counties; etc.
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {249533/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Domestic Violence
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Victims
Budgets
Counties
Domestic Violence
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Victims