MD SB810 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Emergency Management to take action to reduce the disaster risk and vulnerability of critical infrastructure; establishing the Critical Infrastructure Cybersecurity Grant Program in the Department to leverage certain funds to make cybersecurity improvements to critical infrastructure; altering the duties and staffing requirements of the Public Service Commission to include cybersecurity; authorizing the Office of People's Counsel to retain or hire an expert in cybersecurity; etc.
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1339 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Data
emermand
Grants
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
State Employees
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Cybersecurity
Data
emermand
Grants
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
State Employees
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |