MD SB817 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Cecil County and Garrett County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings engaged in agritourism from a specified permit requirement; providing that no more than 200 people at one time be allowed to occupy a building engaged in agritourism; and requiring that the total width of means of egress meets or exceeds a specified standard that applies to egress components other than stairways in a building without a sprinkler system in Cecil County and Garrett County.
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640115/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {514533/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |