MD SB831 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Committee on State Budget Evidence-Based Policy Options; requiring the Committee annually to determine the policy areas in the State operating budget that should receive an analysis of evidence-based policy options and to report on the analysis on or before October 1 of each year begining in 2013; requesting the Governor to review the Committee's report during the preparation of a proposed budget; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to include consideration of the Committee's report in studies; etc.
Title
State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy Options
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Juvenile Causes
Legislative Services, Department of
Operating Budget
Reports
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Juvenile Causes
Legislative Services, Department of
Operating Budget
Reports