MD SB831 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a certain test on an elevator unit performed in connection with a certain inspection be performed by a certain licensed elevator mechanic; requiring a third-party qualified elevator inspector to be physically present during a certain test in its entirety to witness that the test has been performed correctly and to verify the proper recording of the result; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish an apprenticeship program for third-party qualified elevator inspectors; etc.
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {293327/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207273/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Apprentices
Elevators
Examinations
Inspections
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Elevators
Examinations
Inspections
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety