MD SB838 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to identify separately within the Department of Transportation's annual budget at least $4,305,908 of funding in fiscal year 2024 and a certain amount of funding in all subsequent fiscal years to be used for county elderly and handicapped transportation service; and requiring, on or before December 1 each year, the Secretary to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the amount of funding distributed to each county and municipality under the Act.
Title
Transportation – Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service – County Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {213723/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1019 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Budgets
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 2 | 103.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |