MD SB864 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center as the State's Regional Higher Education Community of Innovation; and altering the purposes of the Universities at Shady Grove to include serving a diverse citizenry in an innovative manner to meet the educational needs of the region and fostering individual academic success leading to career success which positively impacts the entire economy of the region.
Title
Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Designation as Community of Innovation
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB1020 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Subjects
Budgets
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment