MD SB869 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to direct reimbursement by health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations for transportation by ambulance.
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {277070/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Ambulances
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset