MD SB869 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, for certain fiscal years, certain concentration of poverty levels required for certain eligible schools to receive certain personnel and per pupil grants under the Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program – Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0869?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0869f.pdf |