MD SB875 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-15 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-15 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to recommend a beverage container deposit program to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 15, 2012; and requiring the recommended program to include specified requirements, determinations, and related provisions.
Title
Environment - Beverage Container Deposit Program - Recommendation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | Re-assigned Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance & Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0875.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0875f.pdf |