MD SB884 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB973
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a Baltimore City school police officer and a school resource officer to carry a firearm while present on the premises of the school to which the officer is assigned.
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB884 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Subjects
Baltimore City
Education
Guns
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Safety
School Administration
Education
Guns
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Safety
School Administration