MD SB884 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certain exception to the authority of the Child Support Administration to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of an individual's child support arrearages for the purpose of suspending the individual's driver's license or privilege to drive if the obligor's family income is not greater than 300% of the federal poverty level unless the obligor has been judicially determined to be voluntarily impoverished.
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923222/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Family Law
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Salaries and Compensation
Support of Dependents
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Family Law
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Salaries and Compensation
Support of Dependents
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 10 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |