MD SB888 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on the second and third Sunday of the deer firearms season in Dorchester County, subject to certain provisions of law.
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {274630/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Animals
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Dorchester County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Privacy
Time
Weapons
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Dorchester County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Privacy
Time
Weapons