MD SB89 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the City of Annapolis to the list of subdivisions in which a holder of an alcoholic beverages license may exercise all of the privileges conferred by that license on the day of any election in that subdivision.
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Elections
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Elections